Grenning v. Key
Petitioner: Neil Grenning
Respondent: James Key
Case Number: 3:2016cv05983
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Robert J. Bryan on Petitioner's 78 Response to Respondent's Presumptive Motion to Strike Petitioners Objections to Report and Recommendation, construed as a motion to consider the objections, is denied as moot. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Neil Grenning, Prisoner ID: 872019)(GMR)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 73 Objections by Judge Robert J. Bryan. A Certificate of Appealability shall not issue. **11 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Neil Grenning, Prisoner ID: 872019)(GMR)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER on case schedule: the deadline for the Response to the 73 OBJECTIONS to 61 Report and Recommendation is due by August 2, 2018; and the Report and Recommendation is noted for consideration on August 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Neil Grenning, Prisoner ID: 872019)(CMG)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 66 Motion for Stay and Abeyance of Habeas Proceedings, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Neil Grenning, Prisoner ID: 872019)(GMR)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing: Respondent is directed to file, on or before 3/1/18, a supplemental answer addressing Ground 5 on the merits. Petitioner may file a supplemental traverse on or before 3/29/18. Respondent may file a reply to the suppl emental traverse on or before 4/6/18. The Clerk of Court is directed to re-note the Petition for consideration for 4/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Neil Grenning, Prisoner ID: 872019)(CMG)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ON RESPONDENT'S 30 OBJECTION TO AND APPEAL FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 28 ORDER, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. The Respondent's Objection IS DENIED and the appeal IS DISMISSED. This case is fully RE-REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Christel. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Neil Grenning, Prisoner ID: 872019)(GMR)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The Court appoints the Federal Public Defender for the Western District of Washington (FPD) as limited counsel for Petitioner. The FPD's representation of Petitioner is l imited to matters related to the production and review of any supplemental record. The Clerk shall provide a copy of this Order to: Michael Filipovic, Federal Public Defender. The Clerk is also directed to re-note the Habeas Petition for August 25, 2017. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Neil Grenning, Prisoner ID: 872019)(GMR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grenning v. Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Neil Grenning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Key
Represented By: Paul Douglas Weisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?