United States of America v. Lal
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Rajneel R Lal
Case Number: 3:2016mc05024
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CERTIFICATION, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENT TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CONTEMPT OF COURT re 9 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom D before Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF ENFORCEMENT OF SUMMONS, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR: cc: respondent via 1st Class Mail & Certified Mail) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/26/2016) (GMR).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Aditi Paranjpye(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rajneel R Lal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?