Puget Soundkeeper Alliance v. APM Terminals Tacoma LLC
Plaintiff: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance
Defendant: APM Terminals Tacoma LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv05016
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's and Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Soundkeeper's motion for partial summary judgment 196 and the Port's cross-motion for partial summary judgment 210 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk shall terminate the Port as a defendant. (DK)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER Granting Defendant's 176 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 281 Motion to Seal, Denying Without Prejudice Defendant's 283 Motion in Limine, and Denying Defendant's 299 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(DK)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS 225 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 246 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (ERA)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief and re-noting 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 196 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 210 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 196 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 232 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Amended Cross Claim 221 . Noting Date = 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Denying Plaintiff's Third Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. APMs 134 Motion to Dismiss Crossclaim and SSAs 136 Motion to Dismiss, are Granted; and Soundkeepers Third 146 Motion for Leave to Amend is Denied. The Port may file an amended answer no later than February 8, 2019. (GMR)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 108 Motion to Enter Consent Decree by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Dismiss; granting 95 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. (TG)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 46 Motion for Leave to amend. Dkts. 33, 49 and 67 are DENIED without prejudice. (TG)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance v. APM Terminals Tacoma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Alyssa Lee Englebrecht
Represented By: Eric D Lowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APM Terminals Tacoma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?