Sousie et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Alexander M. Sousie and Amy N. Sousie
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv05078
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 93 Motion to Disqualify; denying 106 Motion to strike defense counsel as witness.(TG)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(TG)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 92 Motion for Reconsideration.(TG)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 48 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and declining production after in camera review.(TG)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Compel; 48 MOTION to strike improperly disclosed "rebuttal" expert testimony re 45 Disclosure of Rebuttal Witnesses: Noting Date 3/9/2018.(TG)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 27 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel & denying 28 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Allstate to file amended answer by May 12, 2017. (TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sousie et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander M. Sousie
Represented By: Matthew B Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy N. Sousie
Represented By: Matthew B Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Alison Elyse O'Neill
Represented By: Rick J Wathen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?