Westech Aerosol Corporation v. Wilsonart LLC
Plaintiff: Westech Aerosol Corporation
Defendant: Wilsonart LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv05088
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND STAY re Parties' 54 Stipulation. This case shall remain stayed for another 60 days following entry of this Order, during which time the plaintiff intends to secure new counsel. The parties shall file a Rule 26(f) Joint Status Report before the expiration of this 60-day period. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re TC Heartland; Plaintiff has 30 days to amend its complaint to show proper venue; if it cannot, it has thirty days to show cause why this should not be dismissed or transferred; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 24 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay Discovery. The deadlines for the parties to hold a FRCP 26(f) conference, serve initial disclosures, and file a joint status report are stricken, and the parties shall not propound discovery requests until after the Court rules on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westech Aerosol Corporation v. Wilsonart LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westech Aerosol Corporation
Represented By: Ellen M Bierman
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilsonart LLC
Represented By: Noelle L Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?