Gibson v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Patrick K Gibson
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections, G. Steven Hammond, Dale Fetroe and Edith Kroha
Case Number: 3:2017cv05187
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 99 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Patrick K Gibson, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Patrick Gibson, Prisoner ID: 992321)(DK)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 91 Report and Recommendations, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Patrick Gibson, Prisoner ID: 992321)(DK)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 88 Motion to Supplement the Record, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Patrick Gibson, Prisoner ID: 992321) (ERA)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Supplement the Record; denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 73 Cross Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Discovery completed by 1/18/2020, Motions to compel discovery due by 1/31/2020, Dispositive motions due by 2/18/2020. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Patrick Gibson, Prisoner ID: 992321) (ERA)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot 63 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Patrick Gibson, Prisoner ID: 992321) (ERA)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 43 GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Summary; Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Patrick Gibson, Prisoner ID: 992321)(DN)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Patrick Gibson, Prisoner ID: 992321)(CMG)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 5 is Denied as Moot; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Patrick Gibson, Prisoner ID: 992321)(DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Steven Hammond
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Fetroe
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Kroha
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick K Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?