Meier v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Billy J Meier
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, Clark County Sheriff's Office and Physicians Assistant
Case Number: 3:2017cv05248
Filed: April 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 21 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Billy Meier, Prisoner ID: 927382)(TG)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 17 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Billy Meier, Prisoner ID: 927382)(TG)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED 18 Order to Show Cause re dismissal of defendants Correct Care Solutions and "John Doe", signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Show Cause Response deadline corrected to: 7/23/2018. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Billy Meier, Prisoner ID: 927382)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meier v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy J Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Assistant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?