Carsner v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Candy C Carsner
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2017cv05280
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting the 17 Report and Recommendation and dismissing Plaintiff's 3 complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections. Plaintiff's objections are now due 11/15/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carsner v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy C Carsner
Represented By: Kevin Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?