Rawson v. Recovery Innovations, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Rawson
Defendant: Recovery Innovations, Inc, Sami French, Jennifer Clingenpeel and Vasant Halarnakar
Case Number: 3:2017cv05342
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 187 Motion to Retax Costs, Vacating Clerk's 186 Order, and Denying Defendants' 179 Motion for Costs; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(SP)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Denying 162 Motion for Reconsideration. 162 Motion for Certification is re-noted for 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants motion for summary judgment 63 and Rawsons motion for partial summary judgment 58 . The pretrial conference and trial are STRICKEN. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawson v. Recovery Innovations, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Rawson
Represented By: Samuel John Lunde Kramer
Represented By: Jesse Andrew Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recovery Innovations, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sami French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Clingenpeel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasant Halarnakar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?