Willis v. Kiser et al
Plaintiff: Darrel Patrick Willis
Defendant: Nick Kiser, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 and John Doe 4
Case Number: 3:2017cv05373
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 83 Objections. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ADOPTING 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Defendant Hergert's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Hergert are DISMISSED. (GMR- cc: pltf)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltf)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Default is denied without prejudice. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Darrel Willis, Prisoner ID: 854804)(GMR)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's § 1983 action is stayed until 3/6/18, pending resolution of his habeas petition (3:17-cv-05772-RJB-JRC). Plaintiff shall file a status report and a motion to extend the stay on or before 2/20/18 -- fourteen days for the stay ends. **SEE ORDER FOR REMAINING DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Darrel Willis, Prisoner ID: 854804)(CMG)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 26 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Darrel Willis, Prisoner ID: 854804)(TG)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 8 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Darrel Willis, Prisoner ID: 854804)(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Kiser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Patrick Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?