Entler v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: John Thomas Entler
Defendant: Roy Gonzalez and Belinda D Stewart
Case Number: 3:2017cv05407
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 57 GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and DISMISSING this matter with prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Entler, Prisoner ID: 964471)(DN)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of 61 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, Order on Motion to Compel; Plaintiff's objections to the Report and Recommendation 57 remain due August 27, 2018; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Entler, Prisoner ID: 964471)(DN)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying 48 Motion for Production of Records and Granting 49 Motion to add Additional Authorities signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Entler, Prisoner ID: 964471)(GMR)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 44 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by John Thomas Entler; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 18 ; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Entler, Prisoner ID: 964471)(DN)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Defendants' 34 Motion to Strike and Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Compel, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Entler, Prisoner ID: 964471)(GMR)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court will accept plaintiff's overlength reply 27 . The Court cautions that, because these motions are generally disfavored, the Court will not look favorably on motions to exceed page limits in the future. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Entler, Prisoner ID: 964471)(CMG)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. The Court directs the Clerk to docket the proposed amended complaint (Dkt. 6-1) as the amended complaint. Because the amended complaint does not contain any allegations against defendant Belinda Stewart or a RLUIPA claim, the Court denies plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss the RLUPIA claim (Dkt. 6 ) as moot. (cc: DOC, WAWD Finance) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Entler, Prisoner ID: 964471)(GMR)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by John Thomas Entler; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Show Cause Response or filing fee due by 7/14/2017. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Entler, Prisoner ID: 964471)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entler v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas Entler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?