Casterlow-Bey v. Trafford Publishing Company
Plaintiff: Gary Casterlow-Bey
Defendant: Trafford Publishing Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv05459
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. (JL)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REQUESTING SUBPOENA FOR NON-PARTY DISCOVERY AND ON MOTION FOR MEDIATION signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (Paper copy to Plaintiff at Tacoma address.) (TC)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO APPOINT MEDIATOR AS ESTABLISHED BY LCR 7 (F), FOR TRO, AND FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (cc to plaintiff at Tacoma address.) (TC)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENTER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, denying 26 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copies sent to plaintiff @ Pierce County Jail address and Melissa M. Bauer, Secretary Get Published at Bloomington, IN address. (JL)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT STANDBY COUNSEL, MOTION REQUESTING CONFERENCE, AND REQUEST FOR PRO SE ORDER, denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Order; denying 15 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff with copy of Dkt 6 . (JL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casterlow-Bey v. Trafford Publishing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Casterlow-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trafford Publishing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?