Offutt Evanger v. Georgia-Pacific Company
Plaintiff: Shanna Offutt Evanger
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv05521
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE TRIAL DATE, REMOTE TRIAL PROCEEDINGS, AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE: The trial in this matter is scheduled to begin on May 3, 2021. The Court has a scheduling conflict the week of May 3-7, 2021. Therefore, the trial is rescheduled to begin on May 10, 2021. The pretrial conference remains scheduled for April 19, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. and will be held using remote video technology. The orders on motions in limine previously issued by Judge Leighton (Dkt. Nos. 72 and 115 ) will remain in e ffect for the second trial. As a result, the Court strikes the March 29, 2021 deadline for the parties to file motions in limine, and directs the parties to refrain from filing additional motions in limine. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LH)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 27 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Offutt Evanger v. Georgia-Pacific Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Offutt Evanger
Represented By: Judith A Lonnquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Company
Represented By: Derek Allan Bishop
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?