Brown v. Bruley et al

Plaintiff: Kevin A Brown
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Christina Bruley, Mark Seigall, John Cambell, Z Figcuss, Ryan Pfaff, Ron Haynes, Katherin Jenson, Christian Dieker, Brandon Heimbigner and John Harmon
Case Number: 3:2017cv05524
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Referring Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 81 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kevin Brown, Prisoner ID: 308883)(TG)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER STRIKING 78 SURREPLY signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kevin Brown, Prisoner ID: 308883)(GMR)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 41 Motion to strike statement submitted by non-party Jessyca Swatman; denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying 50 Motion to Submit Sworn Declaration of Witness Jessyca Swatman. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kevin Brown, Prisoner ID: 308883)(CMG)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER striking Plaintiff's 36 Motion requesting the Court direct Defendants to provide initial disclosures, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kevin Brown, Prisoner ID: 308883)(CMG)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 30 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kevin Brown, Prisoner ID: 308883)(TG)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kevin Brown, Prisoner ID: 308883)(CMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Bruley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Bruley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Seigall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cambell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Figcuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherin Jenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Dieker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Heimbigner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?