Williams v. Warner
Plaintiff: James A Williams
Defendant: Bernard E Warner
Case Number: 3:2017cv05615
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 24 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(TG)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel Denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Extension of Time and Motion to Appoint Counsel; and Re-noting the Motion for Injunctive Relief within the 21 Motion for Extension of Time and 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for June 29, 2018. Plaintiff now has until June 26, 2018, to file his Amended Complaint. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(GMR)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard E Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?