McDaniels v. Preito et al
Plaintiff: Peter J. McDaniels
Defendant: Kathleen Preito, Marcia McCormick and Gary Bohan
Case Number: 3:2017cv05801
Filed: October 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 69 granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(DN)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs. The Court will consider Plaintiff's entire 40-page Motion to Compel when the Court makes its determination. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(CMG)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying 33 Motion to Serve Subpoena and Denying 34 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniels v. Preito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter J. McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Preito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Bohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?