Deem v Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sherri L. Deem
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Crane Co, Foster-Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, IMO Industries Inc and Warren Pumps LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv05965
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 458 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re 457 Stipulation, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES, REOPENING CASE, REQUESTING RESPONSES, AND RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The Clerk shall reopen 3:18-cv-05527-BHS; and deconsolidate 3:17-cv-05965-BHS and 3:18-cv-05527-BHS; Deem may fi le supplemental responses to the pending summary judgment motions by the Deem 1 defendants, (Dkts. 63 , 65 , 232 , 261 ), no later than January 17, 2020; Defendants may file supplemental replies no later than January 22, 2020; and the pretrial conference is continued to February 3, 2020 at 11:00a m. (**Remaining Deem 2 defendants FMC Corporation and McNally Industries LLC are terminated.)(GMR)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting 263 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 340 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying as moot 372 Motion to Dismiss, 377 Motion for Leave, 72 Motion for Summary Judgment, 245 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant John Crane Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER denying as moot 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 371 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Crosby Valve LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER denying 377 Motion for Leave; denying 239 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 254 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 274 Motion for Extension of Time; Cleaver-Brooks Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 125 Motion to Dismiss; granting 165 Motion to apply maritime law; denying 182 Motion to Certify. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 69 Defendants FMC Corporation, McNally Industries LLC., Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER RESERVING RULING & Requesting Supplemental Briefing on 61 Motion for Summary Judgment, 63 Motion for Summary Judgment and 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motions are RE-NOTED for 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting in Part 42 MOTION for Consolidation, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The Motion is granted in part to the extent that this matter is consolidated with Cause No. 3:18-cv-05527-BHS for purposes of discovery and for purposes o f handling pretrial matters through the Court's disposition of summary judgment or such other time prior to trial as the Court deems appropriate; and denied in part because the Court will not consolidate these actions for trial at this time and will reserve any determination of that issue until discovery is completed. This ruling is without prejudice, and plaintiff may again move to consolidate these actions for trial after discovery has closed. The parties shall agree to an amended caption that adequately reflects the consolidated actions. The Clerk shall administratively close Cause No. 3:18-cv-05527-BHS, strike the scheduling order in this action, and issue a new abbreviated scheduling order consistent with the scheduling order in Cause No. 3:18-cv-05527-BHS. (GMR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deem v Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri L. Deem
Represented By: Thomas J. Breen
Represented By: Lucas W.H. Garrett
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?