Landmark Technology LLC v. Blade-Tech Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology LLC
Defendant: Blade-Tech Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05506
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER - The parties have notified the Court that this matter has settled, all pending deadlines are stricken; dismissal papers will be due by 9/10/18, if additional time is needed, please contact the Court at 253-882-3842; as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 18 PRAECIPE to attach document (Signature Page re Statement of Local Counsel John F. Eyrich) re 16 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. (Eyrich, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 PRAECIPE to attach document (Signature Page re Statement of Local Counsel John F. Eyrich) re 15 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. (Eyrich, John)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on the #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert Muller for Blade-Tech Industries, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF SIGNATURE. The #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Muller, and #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laurence Cheng were not signed by local counsel JOHN EYRICH. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (CMG)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on the #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence Cheng for Blade-Tech Industries, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert Muller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5436516 (Attachments: #1 Electronic Case Filing Agreement)(Eyrich, John)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laurence Cheng FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5436404 (Attachments: #1 Electronic Case Filing Agreement)(Eyrich, John)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion; Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. answer due 8/20/2018; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
July 18, 2018 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline, filed by Defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/20/2018, (Eyrich, John)
July 18, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. (Eyrich, John)
July 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Frederick Eyrich on behalf of Defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc.. (Eyrich, John)
July 6, 2018 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. on 6/29/2018 (Lee, John)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/10/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/17/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 25, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. (CMG)
June 25, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (Attachments: #1 complaint)(CMG)
June 25, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (CMG)
June 22, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Landmark Technology LLC (Lee, John)
June 22, 2018 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Landmark Technology LLC (Lee, John)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Blade-Tech Industries, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5367869), filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Lee, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Technology LLC v. Blade-Tech Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology LLC
Represented By: John A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blade-Tech Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Laurence Cheng
Represented By: John Frederick Eyrich
Represented By: Robert Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?