Hagmann v. United States of America

Petitioner: William Hagmann
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05574
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2018 9 Mail addressed to William Hagmann (address and prisoner number incorrect) Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order. (NOTE: docket updated to reflect correct address and prisoner number; #6 Order re-sent to petitioner. ) (GMR)
August 16, 2018 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Matthew H Thomas for Respondent United States of America. (Thomas, Matthew)
August 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua T Ferrentino on behalf of Respondent United States of America. (Ferrentino, Joshua)
August 14, 2018 Motion to Vacate re #5 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 9/28/2018. (TG)
August 14, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle Requiring Answer. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)
August 14, 2018 ***Motion terminated: Motion for ifp re #1 Application NOTED on motion calendar. (TG)
August 14, 2018 MINUTE ENTRY at the direction of the Honorable Benjamin H. Settle: Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot because there is no filing fee for a motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)
August 6, 2018 5 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by William Hagmann. Related to criminal case: 3:16-cr-05600-BHS-11. (Attachments: #1 Case Law and Supreme Court Decision, #2 Declaration of William D Hagmann, #3 Transmittal Letter, #4 Envelope, #5 IFP Application (duplicate to #1 ))(GMR)
July 30, 2018 4 LETTER from William Hagmann re #3 Order to Show Cause. (NOTE: 2255 form mailed to petitioner with updated court phone number information.) (GMR) Modified on 7/31/2018 (GMR).
July 19, 2018 Motion for ifp re #1 Application NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 8/17/2018. (TG)
July 19, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Show Cause Response due by 8/17/2018. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)
July 19, 2018 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SP)
July 16, 2018 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Petitioner William Hagmann. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagmann v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Hagmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Mark P Parrent
Represented By: Marci L. Ellsworth
Represented By: Matthew H Thomas
Represented By: Carl A Colasurdo
Represented By: Joshua T Ferrentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?