Block v. King County Superior Court et al
Plaintiff: Anne Block and Anne K Block
Defendant: Anne Marie Soto, Laura Inveen, King County, Kenyon Disend, PLLC, Judge Beth Andrus, Amanda Butler, Judge Michael Scott, Shannon M. Ragonsei, Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc, King County Superior Court, Judge Julie Spector, Judge Invent, William Clem, Disend PLLC, Ann Marie Soto, Shannon Ragonesi, Judge Laura Inveen and Keating, Bucklin, and McCormack Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv05579
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amanda Butler, William Clem, Disend PLLC, Keating, Bucklin, and McCormack Inc, Shannon Ragonesi, Ann Marie Soto, TO RESPONSE to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Ragonesi, Shannon)
August 14, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Anne K Block, to #17 MOTION for Extension of Time , #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Block, Anne)
August 14, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiff Anne K Block. Noting Date 8/17/2018, (Block, Anne)
August 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE: Plaintiff Anne K Block has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
July 31, 2018 Attorney Michael R Kenyon added for Disend PLLC and Ann Marie Soto per #15 Notice of Appearance. (CMG)
July 31, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ann Marie Josephine Soto on behalf of Defendants Disend PLLC, Ann Marie Soto. (Soto, Ann Marie)
July 25, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Amanda Butler, William Clem, Disend PLLC, Keating, Bucklin, and McCormack Inc, Shannon Ragonesi, Ann Marie Soto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/17/2018, (Ragonesi, Shannon)
July 25, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings by Kelly Miller, Deputy Clerk, on behalf of Clerk of Court, William M. McCool. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (Cc to BHS) (KAM)
July 25, 2018 ***Consent deadline terminated; case reassigned to a district judge. (KAM)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/9/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/15/2018, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 9/24/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
July 24, 2018 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 10/22/2018. (KAM)
July 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #10 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM)
July 23, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER re #1 Notice of Removal. JURY DEMAND - in cases removed from a state court, a separate jury demand is required pursuant to LCR 101(b) and FRCP 81(c)(3). As a result, the Clerk has removed the jury demand from the case, until such time as a separate JURY DEMAND is filed. Thank you. (CMG)
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by Beth Andrus, Laura Inveen, King County, King County Superior Court, Michael Scott, Julie Spector.(Harrison, Tianni)
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tianni Shane Harrison on behalf of Defendants Beth Andrus, King County, King County Superior Court, Michael Scott, Julie Spector, Laura Inveen. (Harrison, Tianni)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (cc: mailed to plaintiff via USPS) (SG)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to attach document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Amanda Butler, William Clem, Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc, Shannon M. Ragonsei (Butler, Amanda)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SG)
July 20, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: The incorrect jurisdiction office was selected upon case opening. Since the Superior Court case is Pierce County, the case should have been opened as a Tacoma case. Case number 18-CV-1056 has been terminated and the case has been reassigned to Judge Creatura, 18-CV-5579-JRC. All future documents should be filed under 18-CV-5579-JRC. (SG)
July 19, 2018 Attorney Amanda Gabrielle Butler for Amanda Butler, Keating, Bucklin, and McCormack Inc, Shannon Ragonesi, and William Clem added per #4 Praecipe to Attach Document. (KB)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to attach document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Amanda Butler, William Clem, Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc, Shannon M. Ragonsei (Ragonesi, Shannon)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc (Ragonesi, Shannon)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Amanda Butler, William Clem, Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Shannon M. Ragonsei (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ragonesi, Shannon)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County, case number 18-2-09444-1; (Receipt # 0981-5400856), filed by Amanda Butler, William Clem, Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Shannon M. Ragonsei. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ragonesi, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Block v. King County Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne K Block
Represented By: Anne K Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Marie Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Inveen
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenyon Disend, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Beth Andrus
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Butler
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Michael Scott
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon M. Ragonsei
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Superior Court
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Julie Spector
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Invent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Clem
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disend PLLC
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Soto
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Ragonesi
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Laura Inveen
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keating, Bucklin, and McCormack Inc
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?