Weeks v. United States of America

Petitioner: Kevin Weeks, Jr
Respondent: United States of Amercia and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05618
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2018 2255 Ready for Consideration; Noting Date 11/9/2018. (DK)
August 7, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Answer by Judge Ronald B. Leighton, re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) (Copy mailed to Petitioner @ FCI Englewood address.) (DK)
August 3, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua T Ferrentino on behalf of Respondent United States of Amercia. (Ferrentino, Joshua)
August 3, 2018 2 LETTER to petitioner re case number and Judge assignment. (GMR)
July 23, 2018 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Kevin Weeks, Jr. Related to criminal case: 3:14-cr-05341-RBL-1. (Attachments: #1 Order from 9th Circuit Court of Appeals)(Refer to attached Order from 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (18-72158) transferring petitioner's 2255 motion to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington, to be filed in case number 3:14-cr-05341-RBL; and directing the district court to deem the proposed motion as filed on July 23, 2018.) (GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weeks v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Weeks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of Amercia
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Joshua T Ferrentino
Represented By: Todd Greenberg
Represented By: Vincent T Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Joshua T Ferrentino
Represented By: Todd Greenberg
Represented By: Vincent T Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?