Nikolas v. BOLDplanning, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marilyn Nikolas
Defendant: Ed Wolff, Rick Wimberly, BOLDplanning, Inc. and Fulton Wold
Case Number: 3:2018cv05645
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Ed Wolff mailed on 8/13/2018 (Schuchman, Alan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael G Sanders on behalf of Defendants BOLDplanning, Inc., Rick Wimberly, Fulton Wold, Ed Wolff. (Sanders, Michael)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Main document - summons BOLDplanning Inc) (Attachments: #1 Summons Wimberly, #2 Summons Wold, #3 Summons Wolff)(CDA)
August 10, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: The incorrect divisional office was selected upon case opening, 2:18-cv-1157. This case is now assigned a Tacoma case number and judge. All future documents shall bear the following: 3:18-cv-5645 BHS. (CDA)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) BOLDplanning, Inc., Rick Wimberly, Fulton Wold, Ed Wolff with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5425557), filed by Marilyn Nikolas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to BOLDplanning, Inc., #3 Summons to Fulton Wold, #4 Summons to Rick Wimberly, #5 Summons to Ed Wolff)(Schuchman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nikolas v. BOLDplanning, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Wolff
Represented By: Michael G Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wimberly
Represented By: Michael G Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOLDplanning, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Wold
Represented By: Michael G Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Nikolas
Represented By: Alan D Schuchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?