Smith et al v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Joanne Smith and Douglas Smith
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Cheryl E Smith
Case Number: 3:2018cv05646
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Sarah E Elsden for Plaintiffs Douglas Smith, Joanne Smith. (Elsden, Sarah)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Geana M Van Dessel. Filed by Plaintiffs Douglas Smith, Joanne Smith. (Van Dessel, Geana) Modified Firm Contact Info for Ms. Van Dessel on 10/2/2018 (DS).
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Filed by Defendant Cheryl E Smith. Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Horton, David)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Cheryl E Smith. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/12/2018, (Horton, David)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David P Horton on behalf of Defendant Cheryl E Smith. (Horton, David)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiffs Douglas Smith, Joanne Smith. (Van Dessel, Geana)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Cheryl E Smith on 8/13/2018 (Van Dessel, Geana)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Cheryl E Smith (CMG)
August 13, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (CMG)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Civil RICO Violation, Fraud, and Breach of Fiduciary Duty against defendants John Does 1-10, Cheryl E Smith with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5430167), filed by Joanne Smith, Douglas Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Dessel, Geana).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl E Smith
Represented By: David P Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Smith
Represented By: Sarah E Elsden
Represented By: Nicholas R Knapton
Represented By: Geana M Van Dessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Smith
Represented By: Sarah E Elsden
Represented By: Nicholas R Knapton
Represented By: Geana M Van Dessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?