Jackson v. United States of America

Petitioner: Tony J Jackson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05657
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
0 Judge: Robert J Bryan
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 2255 motion ready for consideration beginning 11/16/18, pursuant to the #9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (CMG)
October 10, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petitioner's Motion Under Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. The United States shall file and serve an answer no later than 10/29/18. Any reply by Petitioner shall be filed and served on or before 11/16/18, and the Clerk shall renote the 2255 mo6tion and the motion for discovery on the Court's 11/16/18 calendar. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(CMG)(cc mailed to Petitioner at USP Atwater)
September 25, 2018 8 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Petitioner Tony J Jackson. Noting Date 10/12/2018, (Johnston, Charles)
September 25, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petitioners Motion Under Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255, filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Woo, Ye-Ting)
August 28, 2018 REFERRING #3 MOTION for Discovery to: Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (JL)
August 27, 2018 Motion to Vacate re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 9/28/2018. (TG)
August 27, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle requiring answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Tony J Jackson. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)
August 23, 2018 5 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Entered as directed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to Plaintiff at Atwater address. (Cc to BHS.) (TC)
August 14, 2018 4 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SP)
August 13, 2018 3 MOTION for Discovery, filed by Petitioner Tony J Jackson. Noted by clerk for: 8/31/2018. (SP)
August 13, 2018 2 MEMORANDUM of Fact and Law in Support of #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Petitioner Tony J Jackson. (SP)
August 13, 2018 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), filed by Tony J Jackson. Related to criminal case: 3:14-cr-05242-RJB-2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Bruce F. Miyake
Represented By: Ye-Ting Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?