Smith v. State of Washington

Petitioner: John Garrett Smith
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 3:2018cv05659
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
0 Judge: J Richard Creatura
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2018 10 PROPOSED Motion for this scam court to stop lying and fabricating fake filings that only cover for treason, filed by Petitioner John Garrett Smith. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(CMG)
September 28, 2018 9 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Stop Treason, filed by John Garrett Smith. (Receipt # TAC015346)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(SP)
September 28, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected per receipt of $5.00 filing fee. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(SP)
September 28, 2018 Filing fee received: $5.00 (receipt number TAC015346) **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(SP)
September 28, 2018 8 PROPOSED Affidavit of John Garrett Smith re #7 Proposed Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, filed by Petitioner John Garrett Smith. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(SP) Modified on 10/1/2018 to correct docket text (SP).
September 28, 2018 7 PROPOSED Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, filed by Petitioner John Garrett Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(SP)
September 5, 2018 6 PROPOSED Motion for Summary Judgment because Treason is a Crime, filed by Petitioner John Garrett Smith. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(SP)
August 24, 2018 5 PROPOSED Motion to Cease Outrageous Criminal Conduct that is Treasonous, filed by Petitioner John Garrett Smith. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(GMR)
August 14, 2018 3 LETTER re IFP deficiency: - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. Filer has until 9/13/2018 to correct. (Attachments: #1 (blank) IFP form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(CMG)
August 14, 2018 2 PROPOSED Petition to Stop Treason filed by Petitioner John Garrett Smith **6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(CMG)
August 14, 2018 1 Prison Trust Account Statement **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Smith, Prisoner ID: 351176)(CMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Garrett Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?