Almanza v. United States of America

Petitioner: Juan Salud Garcia Almanza
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05673
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2018 5 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Guilty Plea Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Sentencing Transcript)(Ferrentino, Joshua)
August 22, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua T Ferrentino on behalf of Respondent United States of America. (Ferrentino, Joshua)
August 21, 2018 Motion re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 10/5/2018. (TG)
August 21, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Answer by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Juan Salud Garcia Almanza. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)
August 21, 2018 2 LETTER to petitioner re case number and Judge assignment. (GMR)
August 17, 2018 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Juan Salud Garcia Almanza. Related to criminal case: 3:16-cr-05600-BHS-4. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 envelope)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almanza v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Mark P Parrent
Represented By: Marci L. Ellsworth
Represented By: Joshua T Ferrentino
Represented By: Matthew H Thomas
Represented By: Carl A Colasurdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Salud Garcia Almanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?