Jones v. Haynes

Petitioner: Meko Deaunt'e Jones, Sr
Respondent: Superintendent and Ron Haynes
Case Number: 3:2018cv05688
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: David W Christel
1 Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alex A Kostin on behalf of Respondent Ron Haynes. **PRINT ALL**(Meko Jones, Prisoner ID: 745965)(Kostin, Alex)
October 4, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. ( #5 Petition with Exhibits and this Order emailed 10/5/2018) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Meko Jones, Prisoner ID: 745965)(GMR)
October 1, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER Substituting Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (Ron Haynes added and Superintendent terminated.) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Meko Jones, Prisoner ID: 745965)(CMG)
October 1, 2018 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Meko Deaunt'e Jones, Sr. (IFP granted) (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents and Exhibits, #2 Exhibits continued)**165 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Meko Jones, Prisoner ID: 745965)(CMG)
October 1, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Meko Jones, Prisoner ID: 745965)(CMG)
August 27, 2018 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Meko Jones, Prisoner ID: 745965)(CMG)
August 21, 2018 2 Please Disregard LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Meko Jones, Prisoner ID: 745965)(CMG) Modified on 8/27/2018: Clerk's error/no document was attached as filing. Re-docketed as #3 and re-sent. (CMG).
August 20, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Meko Deaunt'e Jones, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibits in support of petition, #3 additional exhibits in support of petition)**168 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Meko Jones, Prisoner ID: 745965)(CMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Represented By: Alex A Kostin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Meko Deaunt'e Jones, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?