Penrose v. White

Petitioner: Brennan Patrick Penrose
Respondent: State of Washington and Daniel White
Case Number: 3:2018cv05705
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: David W Christel
1 Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alex A Kostin on behalf of Respondent Daniel White. **PRINT ALL**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(Kostin, Alex)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #8 Order Directing Service: Corrected to reflect Petition and Order emailed on 10/9/2018. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(SP)
October 4, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. ( #4 Petition and this Order emailed 10/9/2018 10/5/2018) by Judge David W. Christel. (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(SP) Modified on 10/9/2018 (SP).
October 4, 2018 Mail addressed to Brennan Penrose returned as Undeliverable re #5 Order to Substitute Respondent. Per staff at WCC-Washington Corrections Center, inmate is now housed at WSP-Washington State Penitentiary. Copy of #5 regenerated to petitioner. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(SP)
October 3, 2018 7 Mail addressed to Brennan Penrose returned as Undeliverable re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Per staff at WCC-Washington Corrections Center, inmate is now housed at WSP-Washington State Penitentiary. NEF #4 regenerated to petitioner. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(SP)
October 3, 2018 6 Mail addressed to Brennan Penrose returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Per staff at WCC-Washington Corrections Center, inmate is now housed at WSP-Washington State Penitentiary. Copy of #3 regenerated to petitioner. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(SP)
October 3, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE RESPONDENT; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Daniel White is substituted as the Respondent in this action. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(SP)
October 2, 2018 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brennan Patrick Penrose. (IFP granted) **15 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(CMG)
October 2, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(CMG)
August 30, 2018 2 LETTER to petitioner re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(GMR)
August 29, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Brennan Patrick Penrose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus)**18 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brennan Penrose, Prisoner ID: 342867)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penrose v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brennan Patrick Penrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel White
Represented By: Alex A Kostin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?