Sonia v. Warden New Hampshire State Prison et al

Petitioner: Brett David Sonia
Respondent: Warden New Hampshire State Prison and Warden Haynes
Case Number: 3:2018cv05706
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Theresa L Fricke
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and the Proposed Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brett David Sonia; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Noted for consideration beginning 11/9/2018. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Brett Sonia, Prisoner ID: 390444)(CMG)
October 8, 2018 7 PROPOSED Exhibits A-G to the Proposed Petition attached to the #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Petitioner Brett David Sonia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Exhibit B, #2 Proposed Exhibit C, #3 Proposed Exhibit D, #4 Proposed Exhibit E, #5 Proposed Exhibit F, #6 Proposed Exhibit G)**276 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brett Sonia, Prisoner ID: 390444)(CMG)
September 13, 2018 6 PROPOSED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner Brett David Sonia **16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brett Sonia, Prisoner ID: 390444)(CMG)
September 13, 2018 5 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Petitioner Brett David Sonia. (address previously updated)**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brett Sonia, Prisoner ID: 390444)(CMG) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/13/2018) (CMG).
September 5, 2018 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, addressed to Brett David Sonia. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Brett Sonia, Prisoner ID: 390444)(CMG)(address has been updated and NEF will be re-generated)
August 30, 2018 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Brett Sonia, Prisoner ID: 390444)(CMG)
August 30, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Brett David Sonia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 transmittal letter)**62 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Brett Sonia, Prisoner ID: 390444)(CMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonia v. Warden New Hampshire State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden New Hampshire State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brett David Sonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?