Earhart v. Matson Navigation Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. EARHART and Christopher L Earhart
Defendant: Matson Navigation Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05713
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Matson, Inc. for Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (Henry, Molly)
October 9, 2018 11 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages by Matson Navigation Company, Inc..(Henry, Molly)
September 28, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Molly J. Henry on behalf of Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Henry, Molly)
September 28, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip Raoul Lempriere on behalf of Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Lempriere, Philip)
September 19, 2018 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Matson Navigation Company, Inc. on 9/18/2018, filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Earhart. (Davies, Richard)
September 17, 2018 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Matson Navigation Company, Inc. (GMR)
September 17, 2018 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #3 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher L Earhart (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Davies, Richard)
September 5, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/20/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/27/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 5, 2018 4 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 4, 2018 Attorney Marissa A. Olsson added for Christopher L Earhart per #3 Amended Complaint. (GMR)
September 4, 2018 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants, filed by Christopher L Earhart.(Davies, Richard)
September 4, 2018 2 NOTICE TO FILER: of Case Opening Deficiency. ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR)
September 4, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
August 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5455709), filed by Christopher L Earhart. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davies, Richard) Modified on 9/4/2018 (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earhart v. Matson Navigation Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. EARHART
Represented By: Richard J Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L Earhart
Represented By: Richard J Davies
Represented By: Marissa A. Olsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matson Navigation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Molly J. Henry
Represented By: Philip Raoul Lempriere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?