Mapes v. Unum Group et al
Plaintiff: Randall C. Mapes
Defendant: Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv05724
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Randall C. Mapes by Unum Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Denton, Stephania)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company (Denton, Stephania)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Denton, Stephania)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Unum Group (Denton, Stephania)
September 18, 2018 Attorney D Michael Reilly for Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company,D Michael Reilly for Unum Group,D Michael Reilly for Unum Life Insurance Company of America added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephania Camp Denton on behalf of Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Denton, Stephania)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/26/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/3/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group (main document) and Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Unum Insurance, #2 Summons Provident)(GMR)
September 7, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DENIAL OF INSURANCE BENEFITS, BAD FAITH, AND VIOLATIONS OF THE INSURANCE FAIR CONDUCT ACT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5459245), filed by Randall C. Mapes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Engle, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mapes v. Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall C. Mapes
Represented By: Aaron Isak Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Stephania Camp Denton
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stephania Camp Denton
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephania Camp Denton
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?