Smith v. Uttecht

Petitioner: Terrence F Smith
Respondent: State of Washington Dept. of Corrections and Jeffrey A Uttecht
Case Number: 3:2018cv05733
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: David W Christel
1 Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mandy Lynn Rose on behalf of Respondent Jeffrey A Uttecht. **PRINT ALL**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(Rose, Mandy)
October 26, 2018 8 SUPPLEMENT to the #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Terrence F Smith. **112 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(CMG)
October 26, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER that the #5 MOTION to Supplement Petition is granted; and the Clerk is DIRECTED to arrange SERVICE by email upon respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington, copies of the petition, all documents in support thereof, and of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (documents emailed on 10/26/18) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(CMG)
October 2, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER SUBSTITUTING RESPONDENT signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The Clerk is directed to substitute Jeffrey A Uttecht as Respondent and update the case title in this action. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(GMR)
September 26, 2018 5 MOTION to Supplement #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Terrence F Smith. Noted by clerk for: 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 6-15) **112 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(GMR)
September 24, 2018 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Terrence F Smith. (Receipt # TAC015340) **37 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(GMR)
September 24, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected per Filing Fee Received on 9/24/18. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(SP)
September 24, 2018 Filing fee received: $5.00 (receipt number TAC015340). **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(SP)
September 10, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. Filer has until 10/10/2018 to correct **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(SP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2018: #1 Habeas IFP Form) (SP).
September 6, 2018 1 PROPOSED Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Terrence Smith. (No Filing Fee or IFP Application) (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Statement)**38 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Terrence Smith, Prisoner ID: 320225)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey A Uttecht
Represented By: Mandy Lynn Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrence F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?