Ty's Tees, LLC v. Princess Trading Corp.

Plaintiff: Ty's Tees, LLC
Defendant: Princess Trading Corp.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05767
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 Joint Status Report deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 12/24/2018, (TW)
October 8, 2018 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Princess Trading Corp. on 9/27/2018, filed by Plaintiff Ty's Tees, LLC. (Crosetto, John)
September 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #5 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (TW)
September 25, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
September 25, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/24/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/10/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/17/2018, If declining consent, return the executed form by 11/23/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
September 25, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 11/23/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
September 24, 2018 4 REPORT on the filing of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office on 9/24/18. (CMG)
September 24, 2018 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Princess Trading Corp. (CMG)
September 24, 2018 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CMG)
September 24, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ty's Tees, LLC (Crosetto, John)
September 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5482124), filed by Ty's Tees, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #3 Summons)(Crosetto, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ty's Tees, LLC v. Princess Trading Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Trading Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ty's Tees, LLC
Represented By: John B Crosetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?