Blair v. White

Petitioner: Richard Wayne Blair
Respondent: State of Washington Department of Corrections, Daniel White and Washington State Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2018cv05771
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: David W Christel
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 11 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Respondent Daniel White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10; pp. 1-155, #2 Exhibit 11; pp. 156-406, #3 Exhibit 12-13; pp. 407-670, #4 Exhibit 14; pp. 671-856, #5 Exhibit 15-16; pp. 857-1110, #6 Exhibit 17-18; pp. 1111-1527, #7 Exhibit 19; pp. 1528-1709)**PRINT NEF ONLY: Documents will be served in paper form.**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(Samson, John)
November 21, 2018 10 RESPONSE to #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Memorandum of Authorities by Daniel White. Noting Date 12/21/2018, **PRINT ALL**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(Samson, John)
October 17, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Joseph Samson on behalf of Respondent Daniel White. **PRINT ALL**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(Samson, John)
October 11, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. ( #5 Petition and this Order emailed 10/11/2018) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)
October 4, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and to Change Respondent; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)
October 3, 2018 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Change Respondent to: Superintendent Mr. Dana White, filed by Petitioner Richard Wayne Blair. Noted by clerk for: 10/19/18. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)
October 2, 2018 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Richard Wayne Blair. (Receipt # IFP Granted), **19 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)
October 2, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)
October 2, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER SUBSTITUTING RESPONDENT; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Daniel White is substituted as the Respondent in this action. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)
September 25, 2018 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)
September 24, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents (Dkt. #1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington Corrections Center-Shelton. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)
September 24, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Richard Wayne Blair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Certificate of Service)**22 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Blair, Prisoner ID: 947837)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Wayne Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel White
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?