Natins v. United States of America

Petitioner: Aundrea Lynn Natins
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05775
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: J Richard Creatura
1 Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected upon payment of filing fee. (GMR- cc: updated docket sheet to petitioner)
October 19, 2018 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241, filed by Aundrea Lynn Natins. (Receipt # TAC015381) (GMR)
October 19, 2018 Filing Fee Received: $ 5.00, receipt number TAC015381. (GMR)
October 17, 2018 3 RESPONSE by Respondent United States of America re #1 Proposed Document(s) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellsworth, Marci)
September 26, 2018 2 LETTER mailed to Petitioner re IFP deficiency: - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status (enclosed). Filer has until 10/26/2018 to correct. (GMR)
September 24, 2018 1 PROPOSED Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 filed by Petitioner Aundrea Lynn Natins. (No IPF/No Filing Fee) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natins v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Mark P Parrent
Represented By: Marci L. Ellsworth
Represented By: Matthew H Thomas
Represented By: Carl A Colasurdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aundrea Lynn Natins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?