Near v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: HANNAH NEAR
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2018cv05776
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Yates, Andrew)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Hannah Near (Bovarnick, Paul)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 PRAECIPE to attach document Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Hannah Near (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Bovarnick, Paul)
September 28, 2018 Attorney Kevin C Brague for Hannah Near added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Simon Bovarnick on behalf of Plaintiff Hannah Near. (Bovarnick, Paul)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 DISREGARD - TO BE RE-FILED WITH CORRECT ATTACHMENT Praecipe by Plaintiff Hannah Near (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Bovarnick, Paul) Modified on 10/3/2018 per request of filer (GMR).
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew Gordon Yates on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Yates, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Attorneys Tim D. Wackerbarth, Warren E. Babb, Jr, and Katie Bass added for defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER RE: Case Opening Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR)
September 26, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
September 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/26/2018. (TG)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5485089), filed by Hannah Near. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bovarnick, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Near v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANNAH NEAR
Represented By: Paul Simon Bovarnick
Represented By: Kevin C Brague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Represented By: Katie Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?