Carver v. United States of America

Petitioner: Jessica Lynn Carver
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05820
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 4 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in the Northern District of California as case 3:18-cv-06891 on 11/14/2018. (GMR)
November 7, 2018 Case has been electronically transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of California, per #3 Order of Transfer. (SP- cc: petitioner)
October 11, 2018 Case will be sent to the Northern District of California by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. If case is stipulated, the 15 day waiting period does not apply. (SP)
October 11, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jessica Lynn Carver. As provided by 28 U.S.C. 2241(b), Defendants Request is transferred to the Northern District of California for consideration. (SEE CR16-5530-06RBL) (Copy mailed to petitioner @ FCI Dublin address.) (DK)
October 3, 2018 2 RESPONSE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DK)
September 21, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 (Receipt # TAC015369), filed by Jessica Lynn Carver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carver v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Lynn Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?