Vaughns et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Plaintiff: Albert Vaughns, L S, J C, A G, Laura Vaughns, B J, Zoe Marie Townsend Vaughns, Z L and Albert J Vaughns
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv05823
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 30, 2018 6 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings as related to C18-0072BHS. Counsel shall modify all future pleadings to reflect this change. Entered as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
October 22, 2018 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiffs Albert J Vaughns, Laura Vaughns, Zoe Marie Townsend Vaughns. (Gellatly, Robert)
October 16, 2018 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
October 16, 2018 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (KB)
October 16, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (KB)
October 15, 2018 Per #2 Notice of Appearance: attorneys Tim D. Wackerbarth, Warren E. Babb, Jr and Katie Bass added for defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (GMR)
October 15, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew Gordon Yates on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Yates, Andrew)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5504144), filed by A G, Albert Vaughns, Laura Vaughns, J C, B J, Z L, L S. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gellatly, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughns et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Vaughns
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L S
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J C
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A G
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Vaughns
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B J
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe Marie Townsend Vaughns
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z L
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert J Vaughns
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?