Johnson et al v. Washington State Conservation Commission et al
Plaintiff: Eric Johnson and Richard Mankamyer
Defendant: Perry Beale, Dean Longrie, Sarah Spaeth, Jim Kropf, Mark Clark, Larry Cochran, John and Jane 1-10 Does, Harold Crose, Washington State Conservation Commission, Thomas Miller, Ron Shultz and Daryl Williams
Case Number: 3:2018cv05824
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan for all further proceedings by Kelly Miller, Deputy Clerk, on behalf of Clerk of Court, William M. McCool. Judge J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (Cc to RJB) (KAM)
October 19, 2018 ***Consent deadline terminated; case reassigned to a district judge. (KAM)
October 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #5 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM)
October 19, 2018 JSR NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 1/17/2019. (KAM)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/10/2019, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 12/18/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
October 18, 2018 Attorney Phyllis J Barney for Jim Kropf added; per #3 Answer to Complaint,. (SWT)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Perry Beale, Mark Clark, Larry Cochran, Harold Crose, John and Jane 1-10 Does, Jim Kropf, Dean Longrie, Thomas Miller, Ron Shultz, Sarah Spaeth, Washington State Conservation Commission, Daryl Williams (Barney, Phyllis)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint; by Perry Beale, Mark Clark, Larry Cochran, Harold Crose, John and Jane 1-10 Does, Jim Kropf, Dean Longrie, Thomas Miller, Ron Shultz, Sarah Spaeth, Washington State Conservation Commission, Daryl Williams.(Barney, Phyllis)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CMG)
October 17, 2018 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (CMG)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 18-2-04699-34; (Receipt # 0981-5504202), filed by Ron Shultz, John and Jane 1-10 Does, Jim Kropf, Thomas Miller, Dean Longrie, Harold Crose, Sarah Spaeth, Daryl Williams, Perry Beale, Mark Clark, Larry Cochran, Washington State Conservation Commission. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Attorney, #3 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Washington State Conservation Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Beale
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Longrie
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Spaeth
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Kropf
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Clark
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cochran
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane 1-10 Does
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Crose
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Conservation Commission
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Miller
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Shultz
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Williams
Represented By: Emily C Nelson
Represented By: Phyllis J Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Johnson
Represented By: Shawn Timothy Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mankamyer
Represented By: Shawn Timothy Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?