Borisov v. Alamo Rent A Car et al
Plaintiff: Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, National Association, Does 1-20, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Snorac LLC, Enterprise Holdings Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Alamo Rent A Car and Chase Bank USA National Association
Case Number: 3:2018cv05847
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY, filed by Defendants Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike (Taaffe, William)
November 23, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov, TO RESPONSE to #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF OLEG BORISOV, #2 Exhibit TO DECLARATION OF OLEG BORISOV)(Borisov, Oleg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 27 DECLARATION of James B. Zack in Support of Chase Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Defendants filed by Defendants Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Zack, James)
November 19, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendants Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, to #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Zack, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE, by Defendants Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Zack, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov, TO RESPONSE to #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF OLEG ANATOLYEVICH BORISOV, #2 Exhibit TO DECLARATION OF OLEG ANATOLYEVICH BORISOV)(Borisov, Oleg)
November 14, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov, to #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF OLEG ANATOLYEVICH BORISOV, #2 Exhibit TO DECLARATION OF OLEG ANATOLYEVICH BORISOV)(Borisov, Oleg)
November 11, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov, to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit)(Borisov, Oleg)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Contantine Bekridakis filed by Defendants Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Taaffe, William)
November 8, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Defendants Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC, to #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument Requested. (Taaffe, William)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Snorac LLC filed by Defendants Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike (Taaffe, William)
November 7, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Enterprise Holdings Inc. filed by Defendants Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike (Taaffe, William)
November 7, 2018 Filing 17 DECLARATION of William P. Taaffe filed by Defendants Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike (Taaffe, William)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, filed by Defendants Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 12/7/2018, (Taaffe, William)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Devlin, John)
October 24, 2018 Attorney Melanie Rose for Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC added; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment against all defendants, filed by Plaintiff Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov, #2 Declaration of Emanuel McCray, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 11/23/2018. (CMG)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Zack, James)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Crawford Group, Inc. for Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc.; Corporate Parent Enterprise Holdings, Inc. for Snorac LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC (Taaffe, William)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William P Taaffe on behalf of Defendants Alamo Rent A Car, Enterprise Holdings Inc., Snorac LLC. (Taaffe, William)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/7/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/14/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE: Plaintiff Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Deficiency - Notice of Related Case(s) omitted ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
October 18, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants Alamo Rent A Car and Enterprise Holdings Inc. must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/25/2018. (KB)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. cc plaintiff via US Mail (KB)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. cc plaintiff via US Mail (KB)
October 18, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (KB)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (Devlin, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Devlin, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of James B. Zack re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Devlin, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 18-2-01026-1; (Receipt # 0981-5511589), filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., Chase Bank USA, National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand)(Devlin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borisov v. Alamo Rent A Car et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: James B Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: James B Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snorac LLC
Represented By: Melanie Rose
Represented By: William P Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings Inc.
Represented By: William P Taaffe
Represented By: Melanie Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: James B Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamo Rent A Car
Represented By: William P Taaffe
Represented By: Melanie Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA National Association
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: James B Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov
Represented By: Oleg Anatolyevich Borisov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?