Roetger v. Haynes

Petitioner: Jeffrey Allen Roetger
Respondent: State of Washington and Ron Haynes
Case Number: 3:2018cv05870
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: David W Christel
1 Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2018 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel re Petitioner's #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Noting Date: 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
December 18, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File to File Memorandum of Law re #5 Petition; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Petitioner is directed to file a memorandum of law on or before February 1, 2019. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
December 14, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER SUBSTITUTING RESPONDENT; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Ron Haynes as the Respondent in this action. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
December 11, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law re #5 Petition, filed by Petitioner Jeffrey Allen Roetger. Noted by clerk for: 12/28/2018. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(GMR)
December 11, 2018 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeffrey Allen Roetger. (Receipt # TAC015452) **15 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(GMR)
December 11, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number TAC015452. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(GMR)
November 19, 2018 Response to Show Cause #4 Order due by 12/19/2018. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
November 19, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and #1 Application; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Petitioner is ordered to show cause why his IFP Application should not be denied on or before December 19, 2018. In the alternative, Petitioner may pay the $5.00 filing fee before that date. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
November 9, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents (Dkt. #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Stafford Creek Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
November 8, 2018 IFP received - IFP deficiency corrected re #1 Application. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
November 8, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jeffrey Allen Roetger. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
October 26, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents (Dkt. #1 Proposed Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus), from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Stafford Creek Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
October 26, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 11/26/2018 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form (blank)) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)
October 24, 2018 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Petitioner Jeffrey Allen Roetger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Proposed Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law, #3 Prison Trust Statement, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Envelope)**25 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeffrey Roetger, Prisoner ID: 372101)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roetger v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Allen Roetger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?