Snyder et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Michelle Snyder and Robert Snyder
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv05880
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sean P Driscoll for Michelle Snyder and Robert Snyder, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin P. Durkin for Michelle Snyder and Robert Snyder, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean P. Driscoll FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michelle Snyder, Robert Snyder (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5574507 (Gellatly, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin P. Durkin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michelle Snyder, Robert Snyder (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5574501 (Gellatly, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Attorneys Andrew Gordon Yates, Warren E. Babb, Jr, Katie Bass for National Railroad Passenger Corporation added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/23/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim D. Wackerbarth on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings, as related to C18-0072BHS. The parties shall modify future filings to reflect this change. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (KB)
October 31, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (KB)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiffs Michelle Snyder, Robert Snyder. (Gellatly, Robert)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5526644) Attorney Robert N Gellatly, Jr added to party Michelle Snyder(pty:pla), Attorney Robert N Gellatly, Jr added to party Robert Snyder(pty:pla), filed by Robert Snyder, Michelle Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gellatly, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Snyder
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Represented By: Sean P Driscoll
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Snyder
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Robert N Gellatly, Jr.
Represented By: Sean P Driscoll
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?