Kegley v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Plaintiff: Denise Kegley
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv05889
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James L Pak on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Kegley. (Pak, James)
November 8, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/23/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/30/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 8, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 8, 2018 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint, #4 Declaration of Service, #5 Notice of Assignment, #6 Answer to Complaint, #7 Jury Demand, #8 Notice of Removal)(Hunter, A.)
November 8, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Hunter, A.)
November 7, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney A. Troy Hunter on behalf of Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Hunter, A.)
November 5, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/13/2018. (KB)
November 5, 2018 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
November 5, 2018 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB)
November 5, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (KB)
November 2, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 18-2-05372-6; (Receipt # 0981-5530514) Attorney A. Troy Hunter added to party Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunter, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kegley v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: A. Troy Hunter
Represented By: Justin Patrick Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Kegley
Represented By: Loren Scott Etengoff
Represented By: James L Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?