Stroud v. Terrio

Plaintiff: Jimmy Stroud
Defendant: Dr Heidi Terrio
Case Number: 3:2018cv05891
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 JSR due 3/4/2019. (JL)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/25/2019, Joint Status Report due by 3/4/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Puyallup address. (JL)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Puyallup address . Modified on 12/3/2018 (JL).
December 3, 2018 6 COMPLAINT against defendant Heidi Terrio with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) not issued), filed by Jimmy Stroud. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Puyallup address. (JL)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Puyallup address. (JL)
November 29, 2018 4 PROPOSED Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jimmy Stroud. (GMR)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER RE-NOTING #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Granting Plaintiff Leave to Amend Complaint; Noting Date 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to Plaintiff at Puyallup address. (TC)
November 5, 2018 2 LETTER to plaintiff re case number (corrected) and Judge assignment. -The original case number you were provided was incomplete. This letter contains the correct and complete case number. (GMR)
November 2, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jimmy Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroud v. Terrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Heidi Terrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?