Head et al v. The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: James Head and Molly Head
Defendant: The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05892
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Robert J Bryan
1 Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 9 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc..(Woods, Dennis)
November 8, 2018 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. (Woods, Dennis)
November 6, 2018 ***Consent deadline terminated; case reassigned to a district judge. (KAM)
November 6, 2018 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan for all further proceedings by Kelly Miller, Deputy Clerk, on behalf of Clerk of Court, William M. McCool. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (Cc to RJB) (KAM)
November 5, 2018 JSR NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 2/4/2019. (KAM)
November 5, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #4 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM)
November 5, 2018 6 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/28/2019, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
November 5, 2018 5 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
November 5, 2018 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 1/4/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
November 2, 2018 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Kitsap Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MET)
November 2, 2018 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (MET)
November 2, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Home Depot must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/9/2018. (MET)
November 2, 2018 2 DECLARATION of Kelsey L. Shewbert re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. (Woods, Dennis)
November 2, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kitsap County Superior Court, case number 18-2-02766-18; (Receipt # 0981-5530592), filed by The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Case Information Sheet, #4 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head et al v. The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Dennis G Woods
Represented By: Kelsey L. Shewbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Head
Represented By: J. Michael Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Head
Represented By: J. Michael Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?