Gaines v. White

Petitioner: DeVennice A Gaines
Respondent: Daniel White
Case Number: 3:2018cv05901
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Theresa L Fricke
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ana L Yu on behalf of Respondent Daniel White. **PRINT ALL**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(Yu, Ana)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. ( #4 Petition, #5 Memorandum and this Order emailed 12/4/2018.) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(GMR)
November 29, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected upon payment of filing fee. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(GMR)
November 29, 2018 5 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #4 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner DeVennice A Gaines. **23 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(GMR)
November 29, 2018 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DeVennice A Gaines. (Receipt # TAC015438) **148 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(GMR)
November 29, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number TAC015438. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(GMR)
November 19, 2018 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 PROPOSED Petition Under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner DeVennice A Gaines. **23 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(SP)
November 5, 2018 2 LETTER to petitioner re IFP deficiency: - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status (attached). Filer has until 12/5/2018 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(GMR)
November 5, 2018 1 PROPOSED Petition Under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner DeVennice A Gaines. (No filing fee/No IFP) **148 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(DeVennice Gaines, Prisoner ID: 729910)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DeVennice A Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel White
Represented By: Ana L Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?