Perdue v. Washington State Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Ginger Perdue
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2018cv05908
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery shall be completed by 10/14/2019 and any dispositive motion shall be filed and served on or before November 15, 2019; signed Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (SP)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-7. Filed by Plaintiff Ginger Perdue.(Firkins, Tyler)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY DEADLINES signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The deadline for the parties' FRCP 26(f) conference is December 07, 2018; the initial disclosure deadline is December 21, 2018; and a Discovery Plan is due by December 28, 2018.(SP) (SP).
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Washington State Department of Corrections.(Sutherland, Earl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The referral judge in this case is the Honorable Judge David W. Christel. (KB)
November 8, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Judge David W. Christel added. (KB)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Washington State Department of Corrections. (Sutherland, Earl)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Washington State Department of Corrections (Sutherland, Earl)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Washington State Department of Corrections (Sutherland, Earl)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 18-2-04886-34; (Receipt # 0981-5533630), filed by Washington State Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Sutherland, Earl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdue v. Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By: Earl M Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Perdue
Represented By: Tyler K Firkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Musto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?