Strojnik v. Geiger Victoria, Inc

Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Defendant: Geiger Victorian, Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv05912
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Leland Clay Selby, Jr on behalf of Defendant Geiger Victorian, Inc. (Selby, Leland)
December 18, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stuart Charles Morgan on behalf of Defendant Geiger Victorian, Inc. (Morgan, Stuart)
November 27, 2018 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Geiger Victorian, Inc on 11/20/2018 (Strojnik, Peter)
November 13, 2018 6 NOTICE: Plaintiff Peter Strojnik has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/13/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/13/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 8, 2018 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SP)
November 8, 2018 2 Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form as to defendant(s) Geiger Victorian.(SP)
November 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Geiger Victorian, Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Peter Strojnik. (Summons(es) to be issued) (Receipt # TAC015409) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(SP) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct filing date (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strojnik v. Geiger Victoria, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geiger Victorian, Inc
Represented By: Stuart Charles Morgan
Represented By: Leland Clay Selby, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Represented By: Peter Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?