Ahmed v. Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission

Plaintiff: Tariq Ahmed
Defendant: Department of Health, State of Washington and Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission
Case Number: 3:2018cv05915
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Amy J Phillips for Plaintiff Tariq Ahmed. (Rosenberg, Seth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on WASHINGTON STATE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH MEDICAL QUALITY ASSURANCE COMMISSION c/o SECRETARY OF HEALTH, JOHN WIESMAN, DRPH, MPH on 12/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmed. (Rosenberg, Seth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on WASHINGTON STATE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH MEDICAL QUALITY ASSURANCE COMMISSION c/o MEDICAL COMMISSIONER CHAIR, ALDEN W. ROBERTS, MD on 12/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmed. (Rosenberg, Seth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on WASHINGTON STATE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH MEDICAL QUALITY ASSURANCE COMMISSION c/o BOB FERGUSON, ATTORNEY GENERAL on 12/11/2018, filed by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmed. (Rosenberg, Seth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission.(LiaBraaten, Suzanne)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SP)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s). Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission, filed by Tariq Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Summons to AG, #2 Summons to Medical Commissioner, #3 Summons Secretary of Health)(Rosenberg, Seth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Suzanne M. LiaBraaten on behalf of Defendant Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission. (LiaBraaten, Suzanne)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Seth Alan Rosenberg on behalf of Plaintiff Tariq Ahmed. (Rosenberg, Seth)
November 13, 2018 JSR due 2/11/2019. (JL)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission (Attachments: #1 Summons Medical Commissioner, #2 Summons Attorney General)(KB)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
November 13, 2018 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (KB)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Department of Health, State of Washington (Receipt # 0981-5537173) Attorney Amy J Phillips added to party Tariq Ahmed(pty:pla), filed by Tariq Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons Medical Commission, #4 Summons Secretary of Health)(Phillips, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health, State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Health Medical Quality Assurance Commission
Represented By: Suzanne M. LiaBraaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tariq Ahmed
Represented By: Amy J Phillips
Represented By: Seth Alan Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?