In Re Betty J Rees for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of the My Boat

Plaintiff: Betty J Rees
Case Number: 3:2018cv05917
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:183
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT re #2 MOTION to Stay and for Entry of Notice. (MGC)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. cc: financial (MGC)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay and Notice. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings by Kelly Miller, Deputy Clerk, on behalf of Clerk of Court, William M. McCool. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (Cc to BHS) (KAM)
November 13, 2018 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (KB)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds re Security for Costs, filed by In Re plaintiff Betty J Rees. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2018, (Beard, Nathan) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correctly identify filer's role (KB).
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay and for Entry of Notice, filed by In Re plaintiff Betty J Rees. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2018, (Beard, Nathan) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correctly identify filer's role (KB).
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against defendant(s) filed by Betty J Rees (Receipt # 0981-5538567) Attorney Nathan John Beard added to party Betty J Rees(pty:inre), filed by Betty J Rees. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beard, Nathan) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correctly identify filer's role (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Betty J Rees for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of the My Boat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J Rees
Represented By: Louis A Shields
Represented By: Nathan John Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?